Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Helmuth Johannsen (until 1970-06-30) | 1920-02-27 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1979-03-21) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Wolter (until 1972-06-30) | 1942-06-08 | ||||
Burkhardt Oller (until 1971-06-30) | 1942-11-09 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Franz Merkhoffer (until 1984-06-30) | 1946-11-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Grzyb (until 1978-06-30) | 1940-07-29 | ||||
Joachim Base (until 1973-06-30) | 1939-09-02 | ||||
Peter Kaack (until 1973-06-30) | 1943-12-09 | ||||
Walter Schmidt (until 1970-06-30) | 1937-08-02 | ||||
Jurgen Moll (until 1968-12-16) | 1939-11-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Elfert (until 1971-06-30) | 1942-09-06 | ||||
Michael Polywka (until 1971-06-30) | 1944-04-06 | ||||
Bernd Dorfel (until 1970-06-30) | 1944-12-18 | ||||
Horst Berg (until 1969-06-30) | 1941-09-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jaro Deppe (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-04-10 | ||||
Klaus Gerwien (until 1973-06-30) | 1940-09-11 | ||||
Gerd Saborowski (until 1971-06-30) | 1943-09-03 | ||||
Erich Maas (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-12-24 | ||||
Hartmut Weiss (until 1970-06-30) | 1942-01-13 | ||||
Lothar Ulsass (until 1969-06-30) | 1940-09-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1969-01-28 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1969-02-15 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |