Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Richard Schneider (from 1969-01-01) (until 1969-06-30) | 1919-12-16 | ||||
Rudolf Schnippe (from 1968-09-17) (until 1968-12-31) | |||||
Bert Trautmann (until 1968-09-16) | 1923-10-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Bertram (until 1970-06-30) | 1948-11-16 | ||||
Herbert Eiteljorge (until 1969-06-30) | 1934-11-27 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Heinz-Rudiger Voss (until 1973-06-30) | 1942-10-28 | ||||
Hubert Windsperger (until 1970-06-30) | 1945-04-14 | ||||
Engelbert Borger (until 1970-06-30) | 1939-10-04 | ||||
Manfred Wolf (until 1969-06-30) | 1949-01-13 | ||||
Manfred Rieskamp (until 1969-06-30) | 1946-06-28 | ||||
Dieter Stosberg (until 1969-06-30) | 1946-10-26 | ||||
Klaus Vormann (until 1969-06-30) | 1947-09-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dagmar Drewes (until 1970-06-30) | 1937-12-09 | ||||
Joachim Frank (until 1969-06-30) | 1950-05-04 | ||||
Hans-Dieter van der Velde (until 1969-06-30) | 1948-08-29 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Falk Dorr (until 1973-06-30) | 1941-06-24 | ||||
Bernd Spiekerkotter (until 1971-06-30) | 1942-01-22 | ||||
Gunther Augustat (until 1970-06-30) | 1938-05-26 | ||||
Dieter Reh (until 1969-06-30) | 1946-06-18 | ||||
Manfred Podlich (until 1969-06-30) | 1940-05-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1969-01-04 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1969-02-15 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |