Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Elzner (from 1970-07-01) (until 1972-02-28) | 1928-12-04 | ||||
Aki Schmidt (until 1970-07-29) | 1935-09-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Anton Gigl (until 1971-06-30) | 1947-04-11 | ||||
Gyula Toth (until 1970-06-30) | 1941-04-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans Meichel (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-03-15 | ||||
Peter Stokowy (until 1976-06-30) | 1941-05-20 | ||||
Alfred Kohlhaufl (from 1970-07-01) (until 1973-12-31) | 1946-10-10 | ||||
Heinz Lubanski (from 1970-07-01) (until 1973-06-30) | 1948-08-08 | ||||
Jurgen Braun (until 1973-06-30) | 1943-09-14 | ||||
Horst Eberl (until 1970-06-30) | 1944-02-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Klaus Klein (from 1970-07-01) (until 1974-06-30) | 1950-08-27 | ||||
Franz Fuchsgruber (until 1974-06-30) | 1945-12-06 | ||||
Hans Schmitt (until 1973-06-30) | 1946-02-27 | ||||
Georg Braun (until 1971-06-30) | 1940-12-07 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gerhard Faltermeier (until 1972-06-30) | 1943-10-23 | ||||
Rolf Thommes (until 1972-06-30) | 1944-02-21 | ||||
Manfred Matthes (until 1971-06-30) | 1947-01-26 | ||||
Manfred Ritschel (until 1970-06-30) | 1946-06-07 | ||||
Johann Schieber (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-06-04 | ||||
Willibald Mikulasch (until 1970-06-30) | 1943-08-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1970-01-03 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1970-07-29 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |