Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heiner Ueberle (until 1971-06-30) | 1940-06-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Franz Schwarzwalder (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-12-11 | ||||
Manfred Krei (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-09-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Walter Frosch (from 1970-07-01) (until 1974-06-30) | 1950-12-19 | ||||
Roland Kirsch (until 1971-06-30) | 1943-10-31 | ||||
Werner Adler (until 1970-06-30) | 1946-12-31 | ||||
Klaus Schmidt (until 1970-06-30) | 1941-06-27 | ||||
Erwin Rodler (until 1970-06-30) | 1936-08-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Rohring (until 1973-06-30) | 1947-01-12 | ||||
Reinhard Meier (until 1973-06-30) | 1946-03-11 | ||||
Werner Fuchs (until 1972-06-30) | 1948-10-25 | ||||
Bernhard Oberle (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-12-30 | ||||
Karel Nepomucky (until 1971-06-30) | 1939-07-20 | ||||
Franz Schmitt (until 1971-06-30) | 1940-02-22 | ||||
Waldemar Kurpanik (until 1971-06-30) | 1944-06-02 | ||||
Erwin Schwehm (until 1970-06-30) | 1949-08-29 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Manfred Lenz (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-11-21 | ||||
Mathias Volk (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-02-21 | ||||
Hans-Werner Lamour (from 1970-07-01) (until 1972-06-30) | 1951-09-28 | ||||
Jurgen Schieck (from 1970-07-01) (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-05-06 | ||||
Manfred Feldmuller (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-04-22 | ||||
Alfons Wachter (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-03-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1970-04-08 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |