Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Tilkowski (from 1970-07-01) (until 1972-08-31) | 1935-07-12 | ||||
Franz Binder (from 1969-11-13) (until 1970-06-30) | 1911-12-01 | ||||
Fritz Langner (until 1969-11-12) | 1912-08-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Anton Deml (from 1970-07-01) (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Herbert Schweers (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-12-26 | ||||
Gernot Fraydl (from 1970-07-01) (until 1971-06-30) | 1939-12-10 | ||||
Petar Radenkovic (until 1970-06-30) | 1934-10-01 | ||||
Franz-Josef Pauly (until 1970-06-30) | 1949-09-16 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Gunther Kroth (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-02-22 | ||||
Max Reichenberger (until 1972-06-30) | 1948-01-24 | ||||
Manfred Wagner (until 1971-06-30) | 1938-08-31 | ||||
Horst Blankenburg (until 1970-06-30) | 1947-07-10 | ||||
Rudolf Zeiser (until 1970-06-30) | 1936-03-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Lex (until 1974-06-30) | 1946-10-23 | ||||
Hermann Bredenfeld (from 1970-07-01) (until 1971-06-30) | 1947-11-03 | ||||
Peter Brunner (from 1970-07-01) (until 1971-06-30) | 1952-03-17 | ||||
Franz Hiller (until 1970-06-30) | 1950-10-22 | ||||
Horst Berg (until 1970-06-30) | 1941-09-08 | ||||
Zeljko Perusic (until 1970-06-30) | 1937-03-23 | ||||
Horst Schmidt (until 1970-06-30) | 1948-06-08 | ||||
Helmut Roth (until 1970-06-30) | 1950-01-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans-Peter Zacher (from 1970-07-01) (until 1972-06-30) | 1948-01-09 | ||||
Konrad Holenstein (from 1970-07-01) (until 1972-06-30) | 1948-08-18 | ||||
Hans Rebele (from 1970-07-01) (until 1972-06-30) | 1943-01-26 | ||||
Wilfried Kohlars (until 1971-06-30) | 1939-10-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Leufgen (from 1970-07-01) (until 1971-06-30) | 1947-01-27 | ||||
Alfred Heiss (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-12-05 | ||||
Klaus Fischer (until 1970-06-30) | 1949-12-27 | ||||
Bernd Gerstner (until 1970-06-30) | 1944-07-31 | ||||
Franz Schaffner (until 1970-06-30) | 1942-10-29 | ||||
Ludwig Denz (until 1970-06-30) | 1949-01-01 | ||||
Ferdinand Keller (until 1970-06-30) | 1946-07-30 | ||||
Rudolf Kolbl (until 1970-06-30) | 1937-06-11 | ||||
Helmut Reiner (until 1970-06-30) | 1944-02-21 | ||||
Dieter Schumacher (until 1970-06-30) | 1947-08-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1970-01-03 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |