Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Lucas (until 1975-04-20) | 1920-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilfried Woyke (until 1979-06-30) | 1944-05-12 | ||||
Bernd Franke (until 1971-06-30) | 1948-02-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Egon Kohnen (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-11-24 | ||||
Heiner Baltes (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-08-19 | ||||
Fred Hesse (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-10-19 | ||||
Werner Kriegler (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-10-03 | ||||
Peter Biesenkamp (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-08-19 | ||||
Werner Lungwitz (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-04-09 | ||||
Klaus Iwanzik (until 1972-06-30) | 1940-09-05 | ||||
Robert Begerau (until 1971-06-30) | 1947-07-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Klaus Budde (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-09-14 | ||||
Benno Beiroth (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-12-10 | ||||
Gerd Riethmann (until 1971-06-30) | 1949-04-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Reiner Geye (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Dieter Herzog (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-07-15 | ||||
Lothar Weschke (until 1972-06-30) | 1943-10-11 | ||||
Hilmar Hoffer (until 1972-06-30) | 1937-11-14 | ||||
Hans Hagele (until 1971-06-30) | 1940-07-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1970-12-13 00:00 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1971-02-20 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1971-04-08 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-05-12 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |