Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Lucas (until 1975-04-20) | 1920-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilfried Woyke (until 1979-06-30) | 1944-05-12 | ||||
Kurt Buns (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-07-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Egon Kohnen (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-11-24 | ||||
Heiner Baltes (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-08-19 | ||||
Fred Hesse (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-10-19 | ||||
Werner Kriegler (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-10-03 | ||||
Peter Biesenkamp (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-08-19 | ||||
Werner Lungwitz (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-04-09 | ||||
Hans-Georg Kraus (from 1972-07-01) (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-10-25 | ||||
Klaus Senger (until 1973-06-30) | 1945-10-19 | ||||
Klaus Iwanzik (until 1972-06-30) | 1940-09-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerd Zewe (from 1972-07-01) (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-06-13 | ||||
Dieter Brei (from 1972-07-01) (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-09-30 | ||||
Klaus Budde (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-09-14 | ||||
Hans Schulz (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-12-04 | ||||
Benno Beiroth (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-12-10 | ||||
Leonhard Helmreich (until 1973-06-30) | 1946-11-21 | ||||
Heinz Lenssen (until 1972-06-30) | 1944-11-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Reiner Geye (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Dieter Herzog (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-07-15 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Abel (from 1972-07-01) (until 1974-06-30) | 1952-06-25 | ||||
Maik Galakos (from 1972-07-01) (until 1973-06-30) | 1951-11-23 | ||||
Bernd Kipp (from 1972-07-01) (until 1973-06-30) | 1948-08-12 | ||||
Peter Sichmann (from 1972-07-01) (until 1973-06-30) | 1947-05-24 | ||||
Lothar Weschke (until 1972-06-30) | 1943-10-11 | ||||
Hilmar Hoffer (until 1972-06-30) | 1937-11-14 | ||||
Herbert Gronen (until 1972-06-30) | 1944-01-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1971-12-04 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-12-15 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-02-13 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-02-23 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |