Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Wendlandt (until 1973-06-30) | 1918-01-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Karl Armbrust (from 1972-07-01) (until 1982-06-30) | 1946-08-21 | ||||
Hubert Birkenmeier (until 1972-06-30) | 1949-05-24 | ||||
Harald Hess (until 1972-06-30) | 1941-04-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Fritz Treuheit (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-02-19 | ||||
Bernd Schneider (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-11-19 | ||||
Gunter Streich (until 1974-06-30) | 1944-06-06 | ||||
Dieter Steinwarz (until 1973-06-30) | 1948-09-02 | ||||
Hubert Windsperger (until 1972-06-30) | 1945-04-14 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Victor Dospial (until 1975-06-30) | 1941-10-01 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Bente (until 1973-06-30) | 1941-09-13 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Miessmer (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-03-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Draza Matic (from 1972-07-01) (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-06-01 | ||||
Hans Linsenmaier (until 1974-06-30) | 1941-04-28 | ||||
Hans-Gunter von de Fenn (until 1973-06-30) | 1948-03-10 | ||||
Nedeljko Vukoje (until 1972-06-30) | 1943-09-09 | ||||
Helmut Siebert (until 1972-06-30) | 1942-03-17 | ||||
Josef Hofmeister (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-05-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1971-12-04 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-12-15 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |