Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus-Dieter Ochs (until 1973-06-30) | 1939-10-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rudi Kargus (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-08-15 | ||||
Ozcan Arkoc (until 1975-06-30) | 1939-10-02 | ||||
Siegfried Riemann (until 1974-06-30) | |||||
Abwehr | |||||
Manfred Kaltz (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-01-06 | ||||
Peter Hidien (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-11-14 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Ripp (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-06-24 | ||||
Peter Krobbach (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-01-15 | ||||
Willi Schulz (until 1973-06-30) | 1938-10-04 | ||||
Helmut Sandmann (until 1973-06-30) | 1944-12-21 | ||||
Heinz Bonn (until 1973-06-30) | 1947-01-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Caspar Memering (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-06-01 | ||||
Kurt Eigl (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-03-07 | ||||
Klaus Zaczyk (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-05-25 | ||||
Ole Bjornmose (until 1977-07-01) | 1944-05-07 | ||||
Franz-Josef Honig (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-07-10 | ||||
Peter Nogly (until 1973-06-30) | 1947-01-14 | ||||
Edgar Nobs (until 1973-06-30) | 1953-12-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Georg Volkert (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-11-28 | ||||
Horst Heese (from 1972-12-11) (until 1974-06-30) | 1943-12-31 | ||||
Klaus Winkler (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-05-25 | ||||
Dieter Hochheimer (until 1974-06-30) | 1952-09-24 | ||||
Walter Krause (until 1974-06-30) | 1953-05-08 | ||||
Peter Lubeke (until 1973-06-30) | 1952-11-26 | ||||
Gunter Selke (until 1973-06-30) | 1954-03-08 | ||||
Holger Haltenhof (until 1973-06-30) | 1953-11-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1972-12-09 00:00 |
5 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-12-20 00:00 |
5 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1973-03-03 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1973-03-14 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |