Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudi Fassnacht (until 1973-10-20) | 1934-12-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Willibert Kremer (until 1973-10-21) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dietmar Linders (until 1976-06-30) | 1940-11-20 | ||||
Martin Holscher (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-12-22 | ||||
Volker Danner (until 1973-06-30) | 1942-08-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Bella (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-09-29 | ||||
Detlef Pirsig (until 1977-06-30) | 1945-10-22 | ||||
Klaus Bruckmann (until 1974-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Erwin Haming (until 1974-06-30) | 1953-10-27 | ||||
Ernst Savkovic (until 1974-06-30) | 1953-08-23 | ||||
Kurt Rettkowski (until 1973-06-30) | 1949-01-23 | ||||
Rainer Traugott (until 1973-06-30) | 1949-08-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Herbert Bussers (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Werner Schneider (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-07-26 | ||||
Lothar Schneider (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-12-03 | ||||
Bernd Lehmann (until 1975-10-31) | 1947-09-01 | ||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Jonny Hey (until 1973-12-31) | 1949-09-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rudolf Seliger (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-09-20 | ||||
Ronnie Worm (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-10-07 | ||||
Klaus Wunder (until 1974-06-30) | 1950-09-13 | ||||
Peter Cestonaro (until 1974-06-30) | 1954-05-14 | ||||
Norbert Sobbe (until 1974-06-30) | 1953-12-12 | ||||
Bernard Dietz (until 1973-06-30) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Rainer Budde (until 1972-12-09) | 1948-05-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1972-12-09 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-12-20 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1973-03-03 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1973-03-14 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |