Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Baas (from 1973-11-06) (until 1974-06-30) | 1922-04-13 | ||||
Willi Hellwig (until 1973-11-05) | 1921-01-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rolf Birkholzer (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-09-29 | ||||
1 | Andreas Burose (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-02-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Robert Müller (from 1974-07-01) (until 1978-06-30) | |||||
Alfred Resenberg (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-09-05 | ||||
Michael Windisch (from 1974-07-01) (until 1977-06-30) | |||||
Otto Kastl (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-08-21 | ||||
Norbert Gombert (from 1974-07-01) (until 1976-06-30) | 1957-07-27 | ||||
Klaus Probandt (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-04-19 | ||||
Peter Rabeneck (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-05-31 | ||||
Boris Sikic (from 1973-11-01) (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-11-06 | ||||
Friedel Mensink (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-08-30 | ||||
Werner Novak (until 1974-06-30) | 1951-07-31 | ||||
Werner Jaschik (until 1974-06-30) | 1945-07-04 | ||||
5 | Georg Patzer (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-05-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Horst Wischek (from 1974-07-01) (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-03-15 | ||||
Uwe Habedank (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-05-18 | ||||
Hubert Scholl (from 1973-11-01) (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-10-20 | ||||
Klaus Weiland (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-11-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Hansemann (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-08-10 | ||||
Jurgen Ey (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-09-04 | ||||
Jurgen-Peter Sievers (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-01-06 | ||||
Manfred Schrader (from 1974-07-01) (until 1976-06-30) | |||||
Carsten Baumann (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-10-07 | ||||
Rainer Kunkel (until 1974-06-30) | 1950-04-09 | ||||
10 | Ernst Martin (until 1974-06-30) | 1945-10-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1973-12-01 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1973-12-15 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |