Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erich Ribbeck (until 1978-06-30) | 1937-06-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ronnie Hellstrom (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-02-21 | ||||
Josef Stabel (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-09-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Reinhard Meier (until 1981-06-30) | 1946-03-11 | ||||
Peter Schwarz (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-06-14 | ||||
Ernst Diehl (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-03-28 | ||||
Dietmar Schwager (until 1976-06-30) | 1940-08-15 | ||||
Walter Frosch (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-12-19 | ||||
Hans-Gunther Kroth (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-02-22 | ||||
Fritz Fuchs (until 1975-06-30) | 1943-10-18 | ||||
Horst Bender (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-11-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Werner Melzer (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-05-02 | ||||
Johannes Riedl (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-01-02 | ||||
Heinz Wilhelmi (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-08-19 | ||||
Helmut Nickel (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-05-12 | ||||
Josef Pirrung (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-07-24 | ||||
Hermann Bitz (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-09-21 | ||||
Heinz Toppmoller (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-03-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Klaus Toppmoller (until 1980-04-30) | 1951-08-12 | ||||
Roland Sandberg (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-12-16 | ||||
Heinz-Rudolf Weiler (until 1976-09-30) | 1955-07-06 | ||||
Werner Thelen (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-07-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |