Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Tilkowski (until 1976-06-30) | 1935-07-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Klaus Muller (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-12-23 | ||||
Paul Hesselbach (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-07-06 | ||||
Franz Schwarzwalder (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-12-11 | ||||
Gerhard Neef (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-12-30 | ||||
Walter Spangler (until 1974-09-30) | 1952-10-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Norbert Eder (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-11-07 | ||||
Manfred Rusing (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-06-03 | ||||
Rudolf Sturz (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-11-18 | ||||
Kurt Geinzer (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-07-03 | ||||
Rudolf Hannakampf (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-10-22 | ||||
Ulrich Pechtold (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-07-24 | ||||
Dietmar Schabacker (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-01-26 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Reinhold Scholl (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-23 | ||||
Slobodan Petrovic (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-10-02 | ||||
Dieter Nussing (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-08-15 | ||||
Jan Majkowski (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-10-20 | ||||
Wolfgang Holoch (until 1975-08-31) | 1947-12-22 | ||||
Hans Otto Hiestermann (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-01-07 | ||||
Hugo Faul (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-09-07 | ||||
Reiner Kraus (until 1975-06-30) | 1956-08-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans Walitza (until 1979-06-30) | 1945-11-26 | ||||
Karlheinz Meininger (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-02-01 | ||||
Hans-Gunter von de Fenn (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-03-10 | ||||
Helmut Steuerwald (until 1975-06-30) | 1956-02-26 | ||||
Ralph Eger (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-11-13 | ||||
Albert Bittlmayer (until 1974-10-03) | 1952-11-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1974-10-01 00:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |