Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Menne (from 1974-10-15) (until 1975-12-07) | 1939-12-14 | ||||
Gerd Higi (from 1974-09-24) (until 1974-10-14) | 1919-02-08 | ||||
Uwe Klimaschefski (until 1974-09-23) | 1938-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Orben (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-09-16 | ||||
Wolfgang Kneib (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-11-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Herwart Koppenhofer (until 1982-06-30) | 1946-05-25 | ||||
Herbert Scheller (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-05-19 | ||||
Gunther Rybarczyk (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-11-04 | ||||
Helmut Zahn (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Richter (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-09-11 | ||||
Willi Lohr (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-08-06 | ||||
Jurgen Rohmer (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-09-02 | ||||
Harald Kiss (until 1975-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Franz-Peter Marz (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-07-14 | ||||
Gerd Schwickert (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-08-14 | ||||
Paul Goppl (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-03-01 | ||||
Gerd Schmidt (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-07-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Mahn (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-10-26 | ||||
Manfred Nimfuhr (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-02-26 | ||||
Gerd Klier (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-01-16 | ||||
Siegfried Kostler (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-12-15 | ||||
Erwin Hohenwarter (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-12-01 | ||||
Bodo Martens (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-11-02 | ||||
Werner Nickel (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-08-11 | ||||
Willi Ritz (from 1975-01-01) (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-09-28 | ||||
Herbert Renner (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-09-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
8 : 3 |
Schema Compare |