Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Roder (until 1976-12-20) | 1941-07-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Karl-Heinz Scherz (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-11-28 | ||||
Albert Wenzel (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-07-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Helmut Hinberg (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-02-12 | ||||
Lothar Hubner (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-02-14 | ||||
Harald Evers (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-01-03 | ||||
Friedel Mensink (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-08-30 | ||||
Ulrich Hartung (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-03-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Detlef Wolter (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-12-20 | ||||
Bernd Brendel (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-04-21 | ||||
Jurgen Krawczyk (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-01-01 | ||||
Manfred Zindel (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-10-16 | ||||
Dieter Hochheimer (until 1976-11-30) | 1952-09-24 | ||||
Harald Kladnik (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-07-27 | ||||
Wolfgang Narten (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-04-21 | ||||
Harald Sippel (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-07-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Walter Plaggemeyer (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-25 | ||||
Heinz-Dieter Hansing (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-03-09 | ||||
Klaus Wolf (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-07-03 | ||||
Detlef Webers (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-09-13 | ||||
Frank-Michael Schonert (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-08-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |