Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erhard Ahmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1941-05-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gerd Siese (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-01-05 | ||||
Horst Dreher (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-09-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Manfred Wolf (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-01-13 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Ralf Bahr (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-05-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Pohl (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-12-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Mittendorf (until 1977-08-14) | 1953-04-29 | ||||
Jonny Hey (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-09-21 | ||||
Helmut Balke (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Anton Ruther (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-11-25 | ||||
Udo Jeskarczewski (until 1975-06-30) | 1956-01-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Schilling (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-06-09 | ||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Werner Brosda (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-06-28 | ||||
Volker Graul (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-06-18 | ||||
Peter Schreiner (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-05-30 | ||||
Gunter Srowig (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-09-13 | ||||
Hans-Peter Miss (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-02-16 | ||||
Wilfried Klinge (until 1974-11-15) | 1950-08-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |