Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Knefler (until 1976-01-29) | 1923-09-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Bertram (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-11-16 | ||||
Willi Brock (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-04-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Huber (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-05-05 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Wagner (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-01-31 | ||||
Friedhelm Schwarze (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-12-30 | ||||
Ernst Savkovic (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-08-23 | ||||
Wolfgang Berg (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-05-10 | ||||
Klaus Grunendahl (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-10-15 | ||||
Dieter Renfert (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-02-24 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mirko Votava (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-04-25 | ||||
Klaus Ackermann (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-03-20 | ||||
Egwin Wolf (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-01-28 | ||||
Helmut Nerlinger (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-02-27 | ||||
Zoltan Varga (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-01-01 | ||||
Dieter Goldbach (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-02-07 | ||||
Josef Votava (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-12-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Burkhard Segler (until 1979-10-31) | 1951-03-05 | ||||
Hans-Werner Hartl (until 1977-09-30) | 1946-11-10 | ||||
Hans-Gerd Schildt (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-06-12 | ||||
Heinz-Dieter Greif (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-08-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1974-11-13 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1975-03-16 00:00 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-03-26 00:00 |
3 : 0 TB |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-04-12 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-04-30 00:00 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |