Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hennes Weisweiler (until 1975-06-30) | 1919-12-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Kleff (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-11-16 | ||||
Gregor Quasten (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-10-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Schaffer (until 1983-06-30) | 1952-07-06 | ||||
Hans Klinkhammer (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-08-23 | ||||
Berti Vogts (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-12-30 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Wittkamp (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-07-23 | ||||
Ulrich Surau (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-08-19 | ||||
Norbert Kox (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-01-10 | ||||
Walter Posner (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-02-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Kulik (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-12-06 | ||||
Dietmar Danner (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Herbert Wimmer (until 1978-06-30) | 1944-11-09 | ||||
Rainer Bonhof (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-03-29 | ||||
Uli Stielike (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Horst Koppel (until 1976-06-13) | 1948-05-17 | ||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Lorenz Hilkes (until 1974-10-31) | 1950-08-31 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Kalle Del'Haye (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-08-18 | ||||
Allan Simonsen (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-12-15 | ||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Henning Jensen (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-08-17 | ||||
Roger Roebben (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-03-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-01-29 00:00 |
3 : 5 |
Schema Compare |