Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Abadschiew (from 1975-05-08) (until 1976-06-30) | 1934-07-03 | ||||
Erwin Turk (until 1975-05-06) | 1934-11-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Willi Ertz (until 1981-06-30) | 1943-05-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schroder (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-04-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wolfgang Alt (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-08-05 | ||||
Norbert Hess (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-03-11 | ||||
Reiner Brinsa (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-08-01 | ||||
Heinz Histing (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-09-14 | ||||
Klaus Bischoff (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-11-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Heinz Henkes (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-05-02 | ||||
Hans-Werner Eichhorn (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-08-25 | ||||
Josef Johann (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-06-17 | ||||
Bernd Wilhelm (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-09-20 | ||||
Gerd Schley (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-09-13 | ||||
Peter Bellaire (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-10-08 | ||||
Peter Drenks (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-01-24 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Muller (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-03-30 | ||||
Rainer Reuther (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-12-08 | ||||
Paul Bajlitz (until 1974-08-31) | 1951-12-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ludwig Lang (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-02-09 | ||||
Horst Schauss (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-11-06 | ||||
Peter Schmidt (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-04-24 | ||||
Wolfgang Rossband (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-03-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1974-11-13 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |