Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Branko Zebec (until 1978-06-30) | 1929-05-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1979-03-21) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Franke (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-02-12 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Wolfgang Hoinza (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-11-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Franz Merkhoffer (until 1984-06-30) | 1946-11-29 | ||||
Reiner Hollmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-30 | ||||
Friedhelm Haebermann (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-07-24 | ||||
Wolfgang Grzyb (until 1978-06-30) | 1940-07-29 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Hellfritz (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-09-25 | ||||
Gerd Kuhlmeyer (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-09-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dietmar Erler (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-04-07 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Handschuh (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-11-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Dremmler (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-07-12 | ||||
Aleksandar Ristic (until 1978-06-30) | 1944-06-28 | ||||
Jurgen Weber (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-06-29 | ||||
Eberhard Haun (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-10-01 | ||||
Rainer Slodczyk (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-08-22 | ||||
Ronald Feuerhahn (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-02-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Frank (until 1977-09-30) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Bernd Gersdorff (until 1976-11-30) | 1946-11-18 | ||||
Hartmut Konschal (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-04-02 | ||||
Ludwig Brundl (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-11-23 | ||||
Jaro Deppe (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-04-10 | ||||
Peter Hayduk (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-04-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
4 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
3 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |