Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dietrich Weise (until 1976-06-30) | 1934-11-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dieter Stinka (until 1975-06-30) | 1937-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gunther Wienhold (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-01-21 | ||||
Dr. Peter Kunter (until 1976-06-30) | 1941-04-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Charly Korbel (until 1991-06-30) | 1954-12-01 | ||||
Willi Neuberger (from 1974-11-13) (until 1983-06-30) | 1946-04-15 | ||||
Peter Reichel (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-11-30 | ||||
Helmut Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-04-12 | ||||
Gert Trinklein (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-06-19 | ||||
Gerd Simons (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-10-20 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Andree (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-07-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernd Nickel (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-03-15 | ||||
Wolfgang Kraus (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-08-20 | ||||
Roland Weidle (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-01-01 | ||||
Klaus Beverungen (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-09-24 | ||||
Jurgen Kalb (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-05-20 | ||||
Thomas Rohrbach (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-04-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Holzenbein (until 1981-06-30) | 1946-03-09 | ||||
Jurgen Grabowski (until 1980-06-30) | 1944-07-07 | ||||
Winfried Stradt (until 1976-10-31) | 1956-09-25 | ||||
Bernd Lorenz (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-12-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1974-10-27 00:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-03-15 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-04-12 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1975-04-29 00:00 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-06-21 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |