Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Klimaschefski (from 1974-09-26) (until 1980-06-30) | 1938-12-11 | ||||
Herbert Wenz (until 1974-09-25) | 1928-06-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Kirsch (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-02-09 | ||||
Walter Hedtmann (until 1975-06-30) | |||||
Detlef Behrens (until 1974-11-30) | 1946-10-30 | ||||
Bratislav Dordevic (until 1974-10-15) | 1946-07-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Albert Muller (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-05-06 | ||||
Udo Leunissen (from 1974-12-01) (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-01-14 | ||||
Gunther Reinders (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-09-22 | ||||
Heinz-Peter Buchberger (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-09-24 | ||||
Walter Muller (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Jurgen Heberle (until 1975-06-30) | 1941-11-28 | ||||
Michael Koch (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-06-24 | ||||
Heinz Meiners (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-04-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Harald Diener (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-02-18 | ||||
Heinz Koch (until 1978-06-30) | 1944-02-16 | ||||
Gerhard Pankotsch (until 1977-11-24) | 1949-01-31 | ||||
Gerd Muller (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Harry Gehlen (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-04-30 | ||||
Bernhard Oberle (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-12-30 | ||||
Gunter Kirch (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-10-01 | ||||
Hans-Werner Lang (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-08-04 | ||||
Albert Leder (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-04-26 | ||||
Horst Renger (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-03-11 | ||||
Bernd Sattler (until 1975-06-30) | 1956-12-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Manfred Lenz (until 1986-06-30) | 1947-11-21 | ||||
Otmar Ludwig (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-04-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1974-11-12 00:00 |
0 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |