Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Milovan Beljin (until 1975-06-30) | 1936-09-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Walter Modick (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-09-24 | ||||
Hans Hauser (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-05-17 | ||||
Georg Mogele (until 1975-06-30) | 1940-01-30 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Heinz Michallik (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-07-21 | ||||
Heiner Schuhmann (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-11-04 | ||||
Klaus Walleitner (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-09-12 | ||||
Claus Brandmair (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-05-21 | ||||
Alwin Fink (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Forschner (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-11-26 | ||||
Wolfgang Haug (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-12-24 | ||||
Herbert Hobusch (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-01-29 | ||||
Klaus Vohringer (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-06-01 | ||||
Helmut Haller (until 1976-06-30) | 1939-07-21 | ||||
Georg Schnurrer (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-02-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans Jorg (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-11-04 | ||||
Edgar Schneider (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-08-17 | ||||
Wilhelm Hoffmann (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-03-23 | ||||
Werner Killmaier (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Karl Obermeier (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-09-08 | ||||
Erich Weixler (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-09-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-02-19 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |