Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hoss (until 1976-10-19) | 1939-06-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Paul Hornung (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-08-24 | ||||
Klaus Pudelko (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-11-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Volker Faul (until 1977-12-31) | 1952-10-30 | ||||
Hermann Kohlenbrenner (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-08-11 | ||||
Guntram Gentes (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-12-01 | ||||
Werner Tretter (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-01-07 | ||||
Peter Bernhardt (until 1977-06-30) | 1945-03-31 | ||||
Robert Jung (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-12-19 | ||||
Rudi Seewald (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-11-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gunter Schlick (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-08-02 | ||||
Torben Nielsen (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-12-07 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Dieter Weinkauff (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-09-26 | ||||
Gunther Michl (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-05-30 | ||||
Harry Erhart (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-07-03 | ||||
Alfred Seiler (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-12-18 | ||||
Georg Beichle (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-09-16 | ||||
Raimund Krauth (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-12-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-12-21 00:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-03-15 00:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |