Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Manfred Krafft (from 1975-04-21) (until 1975-06-30) | 1937-12-11 | ||||
Heinz Lucas (until 1975-04-20) | 1920-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilfried Woyke (until 1979-06-30) | 1944-05-12 | ||||
Kurt Buns (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-07-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Egon Kohnen (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-11-24 | ||||
Heiner Baltes (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-08-19 | ||||
Gerd Zimmermann (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-09-26 | ||||
Fred Hesse (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-10-19 | ||||
Werner Kriegler (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-10-03 | ||||
Peter Czernotzky (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-02-18 | ||||
Peter Biesenkamp (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-08-19 | ||||
Robert Begerau (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-07-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerd Zewe (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-06-13 | ||||
Dieter Brei (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-09-30 | ||||
Horst-Franz Degen (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-11-07 | ||||
Klaus Budde (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-09-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Seel (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Reiner Geye (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Brucken (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-09-24 | ||||
Dieter Herzog (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-07-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-03-15 00:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-04-12 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |