Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Georg Kessler (until 1977-06-30) | 1932-09-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (until 1979-10-27) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Wolter (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-06-08 | ||||
Thomas Zander (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-08-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Holger Bruck (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-09-30 | ||||
Jurgen Diefenbach (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-03-27 | ||||
Uwe Kliemann (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-06-30 | ||||
Michael Sziedat (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-08-22 | ||||
Hans Weiner (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Frank Hanisch (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-06 | ||||
Ludwig Muller (until 1975-06-30) | 1941-08-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Sidka (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-05-26 | ||||
Erich Beer (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-12-09 | ||||
Erwin Hermandung (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-08-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gerhard Grau (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-10-27 | ||||
Lorenz Horr (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-09-27 | ||||
Detlev Szymanek (until 1976-10-31) | 1954-04-16 | ||||
Benno Magnusson (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-02-04 | ||||
Karl-Michael Wohlfahrt (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-04-27 | ||||
Kudi Muller (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-05-09 | ||||
Michael Rossbach (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-11-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
4 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |