Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Quinkert (until 1977-08-28) | 1930-12-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Kroke (until 1981-06-30) | 1941-10-18 | ||||
Werner Vollack (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Norbert Brinkmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-06-16 | ||||
Paul Hahn (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-01-16 | ||||
Horst Riege (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-04-27 | ||||
Edmund Stieber (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-01-03 | ||||
Lothar Prehn (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-10-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Franz Raschid (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-10-18 | ||||
Ludwig Lurz (until 1981-06-30) | 1945-01-01 | ||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Heinz Mostert (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-08-29 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Wloka (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-09-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Franke (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-05-24 | ||||
Peter Falter (until 1975-12-10) | 1949-12-10 | ||||
Wolfgang Luttges (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-08-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Klaus Lenzke (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-08-12 | ||||
Dieter Kraus (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-02-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
2 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |