Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willibert Kremer (until 1976-03-18) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dietmar Linders (until 1976-06-30) | 1940-11-20 | ||||
Martin Holscher (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-12-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernard Dietz (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Kees Bregman (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-08-08 | ||||
Michael Bella (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-09-29 | ||||
Detlef Pirsig (until 1977-06-30) | 1945-10-22 | ||||
Klaus Rach (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-09-01 | ||||
Siegfried Sonntag (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-10-17 | ||||
Gunter Frohlich (until 1975-06-30) | 1955-12-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Herbert Bussers (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Theo Bucker (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-07-10 | ||||
Klaus Bruckmann (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Werner Schneider (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-07-26 | ||||
Lothar Schneider (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-12-03 | ||||
Uwe Montelett (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-07-24 | ||||
Bernd Lehmann (until 1975-10-31) | 1947-09-01 | ||||
Klaus Killich (until 1975-06-30) | 1955-02-06 | ||||
Detlef Drescher (until 1975-06-30) | 1955-10-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rudolf Seliger (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-09-20 | ||||
Ronnie Worm (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-10-07 | ||||
Klaus Thies (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-10-25 | ||||
Lothar Pufahl (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-07-17 | ||||
Walter Krause (from 1975-01-01) (until 1975-11-30) | 1953-05-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-03-15 00:00 |
7 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-04-12 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-04-30 00:00 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-06-21 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |