Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Werner Moors (from 1975-04-01) (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Werner Olk (until 1975-03-31) | 1938-01-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Recknagel (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-05-20 | ||||
Anton Deml (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Branko Topalovic (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-07-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Karl Heinz Krekeler (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-07-19 | ||||
Horst Angel (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-05-13 | ||||
Rolf Grunther (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-02-11 | ||||
Hans-Werner Moors (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Werner Huber (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Rolf Blau (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-05-21 | ||||
Wolfgang Loos (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-08-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Fuchs (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-10-25 | ||||
Gunter Karbowiak (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-03-05 | ||||
Eckhard Deterding (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-04-13 | ||||
Bernd Kipp (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-08-12 | ||||
Salem Halilhodzic (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-07-05 | ||||
Horst Pleyer (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-08-02 | ||||
Pedro Milasincic (until 1975-11-30) | 1952-06-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |