Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Diethelm Ferner (until 1975-06-30) | 1941-07-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Heinz Blasey (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-01-01 | ||||
Jurgen Rynio (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-04-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerd Wieczorkowski (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-07-24 | ||||
Gerd Wormer (until 1978-06-30) | 1944-08-28 | ||||
Eberhard Strauch (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-01-07 | ||||
Klaus Senger (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-10-19 | ||||
Hermann Erlhoff (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-12-22 | ||||
Heinz Ridderbusch (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-09-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans Dorre (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-11-14 | ||||
Gunter Furhoff (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-10-06 | ||||
Werner Lorant (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-11-21 | ||||
Uwe Finnern (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-04-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hermann Lindner (until 1976-08-15) | 1953-01-16 | ||||
Manfred Burgsmuller (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-12-22 | ||||
Ente Lippens (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-11-10 | ||||
Dieter Bast (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-08-28 | ||||
Alfons Sikora (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-12-05 | ||||
Jurgen Hasebrink (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-09-10 | ||||
Harry de Vlugt (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-05-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
6 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-03-15 00:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-04-12 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1975-04-29 00:00 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |