Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Elzner (until 1977-02-28) | 1928-12-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Seifert (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-04-22 | ||||
Reinhard Franz (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-01-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Wolf (until 1979-07-01) | 1951-09-16 | ||||
Franz Durrschmidt (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-11-07 | ||||
Rudolf Fichtner (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-10-11 | ||||
Helmut Achatz (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-10-20 | ||||
Dieter Peterzelka (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-09-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Klaus Klein (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-08-27 | ||||
August Deutscher (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-12-15 | ||||
Hans-Oskar Feulner (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-01-18 | ||||
Siegfried Sieber (until 1977-06-30) | 1943-10-07 | ||||
Siegfried Stark (until 1977-04-30) | 1940-02-17 | ||||
Ludwig Schuster (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-03-30 | ||||
Uwe Herrmann (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-11-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hartmut Werner (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-07-18 | ||||
Reinhard Lippert (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-02-27 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Zapf (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-07-01 | ||||
Bertram Stahl (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-02-26 | ||||
Martin Wildgruber (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-11-15 | ||||
Josef Kaiser (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-04-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-12-21 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |