Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Happ (from 1974-11-20) (until 1977-06-30) | 1939-08-10 | ||||
Jeno Vincze (until 1974-10-20) | 1908-11-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Mahr (until 1986-06-30) | 1952-09-26 | ||||
Adolf Ruff (until 1975-06-30) | 1940-10-24 | ||||
Norbert Schumbrutzki (until 1975-06-30) | 1955-04-13 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Harald Bleckert (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-12-02 | ||||
Gunther Klinkisch (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-06-08 | ||||
Manfred Lucas (until 1976-06-30) | 1943-10-15 | ||||
Gunter Bruchner (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-06-05 | ||||
Wolfgang Kauper (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-04-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Herbert Horn (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-01-21 | ||||
Wolfgang Breuer (until 1982-06-30) | 1944-05-24 | ||||
Klaus Brand (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Rolf Kaul (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-09-29 | ||||
Norbert Hofmann (until 1979-12-09) | 1951-08-14 | ||||
Herbert Heidenreich (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Bruno Dvorak (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-10-06 | ||||
Siegfried Grimm (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-12-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Sommerer (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-07-02 | ||||
Manfred Grossler (until 1982-06-30) | 1944-10-03 | ||||
Peter Sichmann (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-05-24 | ||||
Herbert Liedtke (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-10-18 | ||||
Kurt Persau (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-05-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |