Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Udo Klug (until 1976-11-09) | 1928-07-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Rudolf (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-05-01 | ||||
Wolfgang Gobel (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-12-01 | ||||
Uwe Ebert (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-03-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Edwin Westenberger (until 1984-06-30) | 1948-10-15 | ||||
Willi Wagner (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-08-05 | ||||
Stefan Sprey (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-01-17 | ||||
Gerd Deutsch (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-03-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Willibald Weiss (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-07-18 | ||||
Walter Bechtold (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-07-25 | ||||
Manfred Drexler (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-06-26 | ||||
Bernhard Metz (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-05-13 | ||||
Herbert Dorenberg (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-08-27 | ||||
Herbert Pampuch (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-09-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Joachim Weber (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-07-03 | ||||
Hans Lindemann (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-09-04 | ||||
Rudolf Koch (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-04-21 | ||||
Rainer Lange (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-12-05 | ||||
Karlheinz Schleiter (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-11-15 | ||||
Jochen Schmaltz (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-07-18 | ||||
Rainer Kunkel (until 1975-12-31) | 1950-04-09 | ||||
Wolfgang Noth (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-10-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1974-10-27 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |