Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fips Rohr (until 1975-06-30) | 1918-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Walter Pradt (until 1985-06-30) | 1949-04-12 | ||||
Manfred Krei (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-09-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1987-06-30) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Werner Adler (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-12-31 | ||||
Klaus Link (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-06-05 | ||||
Slobodan Jovanic (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-10-06 | ||||
Heinrich Schnitzer (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-09-01 | ||||
Gernot Rohr (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-06-28 | ||||
Wolfgang Poly (until 1975-06-30) | 1943-05-18 | ||||
Bernd Forster (until 1974-11-30) | 1956-05-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Bohni (until 1984-06-30) | 1948-03-06 | ||||
Peter Schneider (until 1979-06-30) | 1943-03-01 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Miessmer (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-03-14 | ||||
Walter Duttenhofer (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-03-07 | ||||
Volker Rohr (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-12-26 | ||||
Dieter Soyez (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-10-31 | ||||
Franz Hoss (until 1975-06-30) | 1951-02-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Harm (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-06-11 | ||||
Bernd Bartels (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-05-25 | ||||
Ernst Martin (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-10-09 | ||||
Heinz Schrodt (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-08-09 | ||||
Wolfgang Ruhdorfer (until 1974-09-30) | 1951-01-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |