Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Albert Sing (from 1974-12-14) (until 1975-06-30) | 1917-04-07 | ||||
Fritz Millinger (from 1974-12-02) (until 1974-12-13) | 1935-09-19 | ||||
Hermann Eppenhoff (until 1974-12-01) | 1919-05-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Roleder (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Gerhard Heinze (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-11-30 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Arno Schafer (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-08-31 | ||||
Egon Coordes (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-07-13 | ||||
Willi Entenmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1943-09-25 | ||||
Manfred Weidmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-01-15 | ||||
Reinhold Zech (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-05-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Erwin Hadewicz (from 1974-11-16) (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-02 | ||||
Markus Elmer (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-12-21 | ||||
Helmut Dietterle (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-06-02 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Weller (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-07-02 | ||||
Lorenz Hilkes (from 1974-11-01) (until 1975-10-05) | 1950-08-31 | ||||
Georg Mullner (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Buffy Ettmayer (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-07-23 | ||||
Eckehard Muller (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-08-12 | ||||
Bernd Martin (until 1975-06-30) | 1955-02-10 | ||||
Michael Hutt (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-09-16 | ||||
Roland Mall (until 1974-11-30) | 1951-04-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hermann Ohlicher (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-02 | ||||
Dieter Brenninger (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-02-16 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Jank (until 1975-09-15) | 1952-11-23 | ||||
Heinz Stickel (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-05-09 | ||||
Heinz Tochtermann (until 1975-06-30) | 1956-01-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |