Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Hoher (until 1979-06-30) | 1938-08-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Werner Scholz (until 1981-06-30) | 1944-12-01 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Bradler (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-08-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Michael Eggert (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-09-29 | ||||
Klaus Franke (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-05-23 | ||||
Hartmut Fromm (until 1977-10-16) | 1950-10-15 | ||||
Dieter Versen (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-06-22 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Dewinski (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-08-31 | ||||
Harry Fechner (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-05-04 | ||||
Erwin Galeski (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-10-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ata Lameck (until 1988-06-30) | 1949-09-15 | ||||
Franz-Josef Tenhagen (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-10-31 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Koper (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-08-29 | ||||
Werner Balte (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-02-17 | ||||
Paul Holz (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-09-27 | ||||
Gisbert Horsthemke (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-01-26 | ||||
Peter Ehmke (from 1975-04-15) (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-07-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jupp Kaczor (until 1980-12-31) | 1953-03-23 | ||||
Heinz-Werner Eggeling (until 1979-11-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Pochstein (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-10-30 | ||||
Peter Kursinski (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-08-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-12-21 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-03-15 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |