Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sepp Piontek (until 1975-06-30) | 1940-03-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 1988-06-30) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Rolf Meyer (until 1975-06-30) | 1955-10-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 1985-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Karlheinz Geils (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-05-20 | ||||
Horst-Dieter Hottges (until 1978-06-30) | 1943-09-10 | ||||
Mario Kontny (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-04-07 | ||||
Rudi Assauer (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-04-30 | ||||
Dieter Zembski (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-11-06 | ||||
Uwe Erkenbrecher (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-11-14 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Bracht (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-07-10 | ||||
Franz Hiller (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-10-22 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Peter Dietrich (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-03-06 | ||||
Per Rontved (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-01-27 | ||||
Bernd Brexendorf (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-10-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Gorts (until 1978-06-30) | 1942-01-15 | ||||
Werner Weist (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-03-11 | ||||
Volker Ohling (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-01-17 | ||||
Franz-Josef Ripke (until 1975-06-30) | 1954-10-11 | ||||
Poul-Erik Thygesen (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-07-17 | ||||
Urban Klausmann (until 1975-06-30) | 1952-06-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1974-09-07 00:00 |
11 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-10-26 00:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-02-08 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-02-19 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-03-15 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-04-12 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |