Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Slobodan Cendic (until 1976-10-18) | 1938-08-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Ferner (from 1975-09-01) (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-01-16 | ||||
Norbert Sauer (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-12-16 | ||||
Wolfgang Scherer (until 1976-06-30) | 1961-07-09 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ernst Traser (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Egon Schmitt (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-11-12 | ||||
Horst Bender (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-11-11 | ||||
Reinhold Zech (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-05-27 | ||||
Niko Semlitsch (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-11-27 | ||||
Manfred Cremer (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-10-28 | ||||
Albert Kempf (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-05-18 | ||||
Harry Fechner (until 1975-08-31) | 1950-05-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ludwig Denz (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-01-01 | ||||
Heinz Traser (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Dieter Finkler (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-11-10 | ||||
Methodije Spasovski (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-02-04 | ||||
Felix Magath (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Husnija Fazlic (until 1976-06-30) | 1943-01-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Schmidt (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-04-24 | ||||
Werner Greth (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-06-17 | ||||
Wolfgang Scherer (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-09-08 | ||||
Frank Holzer (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-03-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1975-08-02 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |