Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erhard Ahmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1941-05-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gerd Siese (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-01-05 | ||||
Horst Dreher (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-09-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Manfred Wolf (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-01-13 | ||||
Wolfgang Berg (until 1977-12-31) | 1951-05-10 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Ralf Bahr (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-05-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Pohl (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-12-30 | ||||
Roland Peitsch (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-09-01 | ||||
Wolfgang Mittendorf (until 1977-08-14) | 1953-04-29 | ||||
Jonny Hey (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-09-21 | ||||
Bernd Wehmeyer (from 1975-09-01) (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-06-06 | ||||
Helmut Balke (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Schilling (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-06-09 | ||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Werner Brosda (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-06-28 | ||||
Volker Graul (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-06-18 | ||||
Peter Schreiner (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-05-30 | ||||
Gunter Srowig (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-09-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1975-08-02 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-10-18 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1975-12-12 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-02-28 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |