Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willibert Kremer (from 1976-04-01) (until 1981-11-22) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Radoslav Momirski (from 1976-02-11) (until 1976-03-29) | 1919-09-04 | ||||
Manfred Rummel (until 1976-02-10) | 1938-07-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Fred-Werner Bockholt (until 1981-06-30) | 1943-06-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Walter Posner (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-02-22 | ||||
Peter Klimke (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-09-01 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Scheinert (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-10-05 | ||||
Manfred Eickerling (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-09-13 | ||||
Willi Rehbach (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-12-25 | ||||
Mathias Hemmersbach (until 1976-06-30) | 1941-07-26 | ||||
Peter Fleischheuer (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Fabian (until 1975-11-30) | 1948-12-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Norbert Ziegler (until 1980-11-20) | 1953-08-14 | ||||
Bernd Elfering (until 1978-09-30) | 1956-10-09 | ||||
Theodor Rielander (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Willi Quasten (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-08-21 | ||||
Peter Surbach (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-09-27 | ||||
Hans-Werner Marx (until 1977-06-30) | 1945-06-28 | ||||
Klaus Rohrig (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-10-31 | ||||
Manfred Schumann (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-12-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gerhard Kentschke (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-09-18 | ||||
Frank-Michael Schonert (from 1975-11-01) (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-08-30 | ||||
Norbert Sobbe (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-12-12 | ||||
Wilfried Klinge (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-08-15 | ||||
Hermann Klebs (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-02-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1975-08-02 00:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1975-10-17 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |