Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dietrich Weise (until 1976-06-30) | 1934-11-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans-Dieter Roos (until 1976-06-30) | 1937-05-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jupp Koitka (from 1976-05-16) (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-02-12 | ||||
Gunther Wienhold (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-01-21 | ||||
Dr. Peter Kunter (until 1976-06-30) | 1941-04-28 | ||||
Jurgen Friedl (until 1976-06-30) | 1959-02-23 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Charly Korbel (until 1991-06-30) | 1954-12-01 | ||||
Willi Neuberger (until 1983-06-30) | 1946-04-15 | ||||
Peter Reichel (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-11-30 | ||||
Helmut Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-04-12 | ||||
Gert Trinklein (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-06-19 | ||||
Gerd Simons (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-10-20 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernd Nickel (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-03-15 | ||||
Wolfgang Kraus (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-08-20 | ||||
Roland Weidle (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-01-01 | ||||
Peter Krobbach (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-01-15 | ||||
Klaus Beverungen (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-09-24 | ||||
Detlev Lange (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-12-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ronny Borchers (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-08-10 | ||||
Bernd Holzenbein (until 1981-06-30) | 1946-03-09 | ||||
Jurgen Grabowski (until 1980-06-30) | 1944-07-07 | ||||
Rudiger Wenzel (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-06-03 | ||||
Winfried Stradt (until 1976-10-31) | 1956-09-25 | ||||
Bernd Lorenz (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-12-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1975-08-01 00:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-10-18 00:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-12-13 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-01-31 00:00 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |