Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Hornig (from 1975-10-28) (until 1976-06-30) | 1937-09-28 | ||||
Rudi Gutendorf (until 1975-10-27) | 1926-08-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Pabst (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-04-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Fahrian (until 1976-06-30) | 1941-05-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Peter Boers (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-11-24 | ||||
Walter Muller (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Rolf Dohmen (until 1977-11-30) | 1952-04-04 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Struth (until 1975-12-31) | 1948-04-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Noel Campbell (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-12-11 | ||||
Roland Hattenberger (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-12-07 | ||||
Rolf Bauerkamper (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-02-24 | ||||
Wolfgang Glock (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-05-26 | ||||
Peter Feiten (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-02-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Modrath (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-09-22 | ||||
Friedhelm Otters (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-07-12 | ||||
Otmar Ludwig (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-04-22 | ||||
Reinhard Majgl (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-12-04 | ||||
Lothar Wesseler (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-01-21 | ||||
Helmut Bergfelder (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-11-21 | ||||
Ralf Hahn (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-09-18 | ||||
Julio Baylon (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-09-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1975-08-02 00:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-10-18 00:00 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |