Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Milovan Beljin (until 1978-06-30) | 1936-09-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Karlheinz Volz (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-03-30 | ||||
Jurgen Grun (until 1980-06-30) | 1944-04-10 | ||||
Manfred Koch (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-08-25 | ||||
Klaus Reinhardt (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-02-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hubert Klein (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-08-31 | ||||
Peter Rubenach (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-09-16 | ||||
Bernd Schmidt (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-11-07 | ||||
Peter Koch (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-11-03 | ||||
Klaus-Peter Stahl (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-05-28 | ||||
Dieter Gebert (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-14 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Richard Engel (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-10-02 | ||||
Horst Trimhold (until 1978-06-30) | 1941-02-04 | ||||
Karl Walter (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-02-08 | ||||
Gunter Kirch (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-10-01 | ||||
Michael Czyzewski (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-12-13 | ||||
Waldemar Pagojus (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-05-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hubert Genz (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-09-03 | ||||
Gerhard Lenz (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-04-07 | ||||
Wolfgang Metzler (until 1976-10-31) | 1952-06-23 | ||||
Werner Thelen (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-07-08 | ||||
Heiko Racky (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-10-01 | ||||
Michael Bordt (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-08-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1975-08-03 00:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-08-13 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |