Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kuno Klotzer (until 1977-06-30) | 1922-04-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rudi Kargus (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-08-15 | ||||
Vladimir Kovacic (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-03-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Manfred Kaltz (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-01-06 | ||||
Peter Hidien (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-11-14 | ||||
Peter Nogly (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-01-14 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Ripp (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-06-24 | ||||
Horst Blankenburg (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-07-10 | ||||
Klaus Winkler (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-05-25 | ||||
Detlef Spincke (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-02-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Caspar Memering (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-06-01 | ||||
Horst Bertl (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-03-24 | ||||
Kurt Eigl (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-03-07 | ||||
Klaus Zaczyk (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-05-25 | ||||
Ole Bjornmose (until 1977-07-01) | 1944-05-07 | ||||
Buffy Ettmayer (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-07-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Willi Reimann (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-24 | ||||
Georg Volkert (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-11-28 | ||||
Uwe Mackensen (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-08-12 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Sperlich (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-02-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1975-08-01 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-10-18 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-12-13 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-01-31 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-04-03 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1976-05-04 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1976-06-01 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-06-26 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |