Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hermann Eppenhoff (until 1976-06-30) | 1919-05-19 | ||||
Heinz Sewina (from 1976-04-30) (until 1976-06-30) | |||||
Hans-Wilhelm Lossmann (until 1976-04-29) | 1936-04-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Peter Endrulat (until 1976-06-30) | 1954-08-10 | ||||
Gunter Dobslaw (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-02-07 | ||||
Meinhardt Erken (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-06-29 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Horst Koschmieder (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-01-01 | ||||
Erwin Haming (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-10-27 | ||||
Lutz Philipp (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-05-22 | ||||
Werner Apitzsch (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-03-10 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Korte (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-04-01 | ||||
Hugo Lutkebohmert (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-06-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gisbert Horsthemke (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-01-26 | ||||
Jurgen Mauthe (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-01-04 | ||||
Peter Anders (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-11-07 | ||||
Gerd Deutschmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-11-30 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Porschke (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-09-14 | ||||
Detlef Schramm (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-01-31 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Seidenkranz (until 1976-06-30) | 1943-03-12 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gisbert Paus (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-08-04 | ||||
Dieter Walter (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-07-25 | ||||
Uwe Kolitsch (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-12-16 | ||||
Hans-Peter Petek (until 1976-06-30) | 1955-01-05 | ||||
Georg Schymetzek (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-07-25 | ||||
Hubert Tenbrink (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-07-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1975-08-03 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |