Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Cieslarczyk (until 1977-06-30) | 1937-05-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Roland Kastner (until 1994-12-31) | 1956-12-27 | ||||
Peter Lower (until 1981-06-30) | 1944-11-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernhard Bergmann (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-12-23 | ||||
Hermann Grabmeier (until 1983-06-30) | 1952-06-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Lausen (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-02-25 | ||||
Viggo Jensen (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-09-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Klaus Heinlein (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-23 | ||||
Helmut Klump (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-08-13 | ||||
Siegfried Grimm (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-12-01 | ||||
Fritz Heubeck (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-07-10 | ||||
Gerhard Schafer (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-04-14 | ||||
Lorenz Hilkes (from 1975-10-06) (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-08-31 | ||||
Heinz Popp (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-09-14 | ||||
Klaus Dennerlein (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-04-09 | ||||
Gerd Efferenn (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-06-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Erich Unger (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-08-26 | ||||
Paul Broh (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-03-10 | ||||
Jurgen Detsch (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-07-27 | ||||
Werner Hofmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-08-31 | ||||
Gerhard Bopp (until 1975-12-31) | 1949-01-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1975-08-03 00:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-08-13 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1975-10-19 00:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-12-13 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |