Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudolf Kroner (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-01-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rolf Gerstenlauer (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-06-15 | ||||
Jurgen Kanzleiter (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-03-16 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dieter Dollmann (until 1983-06-30) | 1947-09-12 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Voise (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-12-08 | ||||
Dieter Renner (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-18 | ||||
Peter Stichler (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-01-15 | ||||
Horst Schairer (until 1979-06-30) | 1944-05-10 | ||||
Alois Schindler (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-11-15 | ||||
Winfried Neuhauser (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-01-12 | ||||
Wayne Cegielski (until 1976-05-31) | 1956-01-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eckehard Muller (until 1986-06-30) | 1950-08-12 | ||||
Franz-Josef Toth (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-08-28 | ||||
Wolfgang Holoch (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-12-22 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schroff (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-02-24 | ||||
Rainer Potschak (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-05-06 | ||||
Robert Redl (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-11-07 | ||||
Werner Roth (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-06-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Hoffmann (from 1975-12-10) (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-07-09 | ||||
Horst Haug (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-05-12 | ||||
Walter Kelsch (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Dieter Rebsch (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-12-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1975-08-02 00:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-08-13 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-10-18 00:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-12-13 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |