Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Antun Rudinski (until 1977-10-18) | 1937-10-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Walter Pradt (until 1985-06-30) | 1949-04-12 | ||||
Ulrich Gelhard (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-05-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1987-06-30) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Oskar Bauer (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-09-24 | ||||
Paul Steiner (until 1979-06-30) | 1957-01-23 | ||||
Werner Adler (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-12-31 | ||||
Klaus Link (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-06-05 | ||||
Slobodan Jovanic (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-10-06 | ||||
Heinrich Schnitzer (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-09-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Bohni (until 1984-06-30) | 1948-03-06 | ||||
Michael Schussler (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-12-05 | ||||
Peter Schneider (until 1979-06-30) | 1943-03-01 | ||||
Reiner Hollich (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-11-11 | ||||
Werner Heck (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Miessmer (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-03-14 | ||||
Walter Duttenhofer (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-03-07 | ||||
Volker Rohr (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-12-26 | ||||
Dieter Soyez (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-10-31 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Harm (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-06-11 | ||||
Bernd Bartels (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-05-25 | ||||
Reinhold Golz (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-02-07 | ||||
Urban Klausmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-06-29 | ||||
Ernst Martin (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-10-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1975-08-02 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-10-18 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-12-13 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |