Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karl Bogelein (from 1976-04-01) (until 1976-06-30) | 1927-01-28 | ||||
Istvan Sztani (until 1976-03-31) | 1937-03-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Roleder (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Klaus Funk (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-02-21 | ||||
Rene Deck (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-06-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Karlheinz Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-07-25 | ||||
Bernd Martin (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-02-10 | ||||
Dragan Holcer (until 1981-06-30) | 1945-01-19 | ||||
Arno Schafer (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-08-31 | ||||
Werner Gass (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-05-14 | ||||
Egon Coordes (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-07-13 | ||||
Willi Entenmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1943-09-25 | ||||
Manfred Weidmann (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-01-15 | ||||
Manfred Gunther (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-09-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Erwin Hadewicz (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-02 | ||||
Hansi Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-27 | ||||
Markus Elmer (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-12-21 | ||||
Helmut Dietterle (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-06-02 | ||||
Bernd Schmider (until 1978-09-30) | 1955-05-03 | ||||
Gerhard Worn (until 1977-06-30) | 1957-01-27 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Weller (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-07-02 | ||||
Roland Mall (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-04-17 | ||||
Lorenz Hilkes (until 1975-10-05) | 1950-08-31 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Harald Beck (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-29 | ||||
Dieter Hoeness (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-01-07 | ||||
Ottmar Hitzfeld (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Hermann Ohlicher (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-02 | ||||
Dieter Brenninger (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-02-16 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Jank (until 1975-09-15) | 1952-11-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1975-08-02 00:00 |
2 : 9 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-10-18 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |