Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Hoher (until 1979-06-30) | 1938-08-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Reinhard Mager (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-05-02 | ||||
Werner Scholz (until 1981-06-30) | 1944-12-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Michael Eggert (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-09-29 | ||||
Klaus Franke (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-05-23 | ||||
Hartmut Fromm (until 1977-10-16) | 1950-10-15 | ||||
Erich Miss (until 1976-09-30) | 1948-03-16 | ||||
Dieter Versen (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-06-22 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Dewinski (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-08-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ata Lameck (until 1988-06-30) | 1949-09-15 | ||||
Franz-Josef Tenhagen (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-10-31 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Koper (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-08-29 | ||||
Holger Trimhold (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-06-13 | ||||
Wolfgang Euteneuer (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-09-01 | ||||
Werner Balte (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-02-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jupp Kaczor (until 1980-12-31) | 1953-03-23 | ||||
Heinz-Werner Eggeling (until 1979-11-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Pochstein (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-10-30 | ||||
Peter Kursinski (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-08-15 | ||||
Harry Ellbracht (until 1976-10-15) | 1953-09-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1975-08-03 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1975-10-17 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-12-13 00:00 |
4 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-12-17 00:00 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |